LA HB341 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the parcel fee imposed within the Upper Audubon Security District in Orleans Parish (EN +$6,000 LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the parcel fee imposed within the Upper Audubon Security District in Orleans Parish (EN +$6,000 LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 341 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1104) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 341 FINAL PASSAGE (#816) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 341 FINAL PASSAGE (#447) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 341 FINAL PASSAGE (#816) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 341 FINAL PASSAGE (#447) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | House | Effective date: 07/01/2021. |
2021-06-14 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 307. |
2021-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-08 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2021-06-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021. |
2021-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-13 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2021. |
2021-05-10 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-06 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2021-04-22 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2021-04-21 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-03-31 | House | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |