LA HB34 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for membership for certain contract firefighters in Jefferson Parish in the Firefighters' Retirement System (OR INCREASE APV)
Title
Provides for membership for certain contract firefighters in Jefferson Parish in the Firefighters' Retirement System (OR INCREASE APV)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2021-04-14 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-02-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/26/2021. |
2021-02-26 | House | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |