LA HB34 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that all mayors are members of the Municipal Employees' Retirement System (EG INCREASE APV)
Title
Provides that all mayors are members of the Municipal Employees' Retirement System (EG INCREASE APV)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | House | Withdrawn from the files of the House. |
2016-04-19 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2016. |
2016-04-13 | House | Notice given. |
2016-04-13 | House | Notice removed |
2016-04-05 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-03-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/2016. |
2016-03-29 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-03-28 | House | Reported favorably (7-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2016-01-29 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/29/2016. |
2016-01-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2016-01-26 | House | Prefiled. |