LA HB339 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 35, nays 50. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 35, nays 50. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to smoke detectors
Title
Provides relative to smoke detectors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 339, FINAL PASSAGE (#393) (Y: 35 N: 50 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on HB 339, AMENDMENT B-128, MOTION TO ADOPT (#392) (Y: 42 N: 43 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on HB 339, AMENDMENT B-128, MOTION TO ADOPT (#392) (Y: 42 N: 43 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 35, nays 50. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-22 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 26, 2010. | |
2010-04-20 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-19 | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-03-12 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010. | |
2010-03-12 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-03-12 | Prefiled. |