LA HB336 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for a single preferred drug list in Medicaid managed care (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for a single preferred drug list in Medicaid managed care (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote on HB 336 SUSPEND AND PASS TO THIRD READING (#178) (Y: 31 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2018-03-28HouseReported favorably (11-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-03-01HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-03-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback