LA HB336 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Becomes HB 1254.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Becomes HB 1254.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the right to treatment for a person with a terminal condition (OR NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the right to treatment for a person with a terminal condition (OR NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Simon [R] | Sen. Ben Nevers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Becomes HB 1254. |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported by substitute (16-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-02-24 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-02-24 | House | Prefiled. |