LA HB327 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to advanced esthetics
Title
Provides relative to advanced esthetics
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 327 FINAL PASSAGE (#177) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-03 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-04-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2021. |
2021-04-29 | House | Notice given. |
2021-04-22 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-04-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/22/2021. |
2021-04-21 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-03-30 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2021-03-30 | House | Prefiled. |