LA HB326 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes surveys of public school students in Orleans Parish regarding risk behaviors
Title
Authorizes surveys of public school students in Orleans Parish regarding risk behaviors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Notice removed |
2015-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/12/2015. |
2015-05-07 | House | Notice given. |
2015-05-06 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2015-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/06/2015. |
2015-04-30 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported favorably (9-1). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |