LA HB325 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Senate conference committee members appointed: Peterson, Walsworth, and White.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the registrar of voters, clerk of court, and Dept. of State from disclosing specified computer system information

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the registrar of voters, clerk of court, and Dept. of State from disclosing specified computer system information

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 325 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#976) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 325 FINAL PASSAGE (#874) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 325 FINAL PASSAGE (#123) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Peterson, Walsworth, and White.
2019-06-06HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2019-06-04SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2019-06-04HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2019-06-04HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-06-04HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-06-03HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/04/19.
2019-06-03HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-03SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-30SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-29SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-06SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2019-05-02SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-01HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/01/19.
2019-04-25HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-24HouseReported favorably (7-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-03-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-03-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB325&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120561
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126994
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130006
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127730
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138684
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139390
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142332
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142615
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120570
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127187
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130164
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139012
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129979
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141673

Bill Comments

feedback