LA HB32 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: Senate Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: Senate Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the duties of the Public Retirement Systems' Actuarial Committee
Title
Provides relative to the duties of the Public Retirement Systems' Actuarial Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 32 FINAL PASSAGE (#1058) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-23 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2022. |
2022-05-17 | House | Notice given. |
2022-04-18 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/2022. |
2022-04-11 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2022-01-28 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/28/2022. |
2022-01-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2022-01-27 | House | Prefiled. |