LA HB32 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-3-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increases the total number of credits that may be earned by an offender upon earning a bachelor's degree or master's degree (EN DECREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the total number of credits that may be earned by an offender upon earning a bachelor's degree or master's degree (EN DECREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 32 FINAL PASSAGE (#322) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 32 FINAL PASSAGE (#82) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01HouseEffective date: 08/01/2021.
2021-06-01HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 5.
2021-05-19HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-05-17HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-05-11HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-05-11SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-06SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-05SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-04SenateReported favorably.
2021-04-28SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2021-04-27SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-04-27HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2021.
2021-04-26HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-22HouseReported with amendments (9-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-02-26HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/26/2021.
2021-02-25HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-02-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB32&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1200978
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216434
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224937
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230352
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216366
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1200983
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212671
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216721
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216995
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227066
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236997
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217967
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223358

Bill Comments

feedback