LA HB32 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Scheduled for floor debate on 04/22/19.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the spousal confidential communications privilege

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the spousal confidential communications privilege

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/22/19.
2019-04-16HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-15HouseReported favorably (7-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-03-01HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/1/2019.
2019-02-26HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-02-26HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback