LA HB315 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the fees for city marshals and constables for certain services (EN INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Title
Increases the fees for city marshals and constables for certain services (EN INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 315 FINAL PASSAGE (#1171) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 315 FINAL PASSAGE (#592) (Y: 71 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 315 FINAL PASSAGE (#592) (Y: 71 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 457. |
2018-05-17 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-26 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 12. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-26 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-04-26 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/18. |
2018-04-19 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-18 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |