LA HB310 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Becomes HB 620.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Becomes HB 620.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to requirements for teacher certification
Title
Provides relative to requirements for teacher certification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Becomes HB 620. |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported by substitute (8-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-03-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-03-28 | House | Prefiled. |