LA HB303 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies requirements for obtaining a commercial driver's license when an applicant is employed in a specific military position
Title
Modifies requirements for obtaining a commercial driver's license when an applicant is employed in a specific military position
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 303 ADOPT (#1384) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 303 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1396) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 303 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1064) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 303 FINAL PASSAGE (#761) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Vote on HB 303 FINAL PASSAGE (#20) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 303 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1396) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 303 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1064) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 303 FINAL PASSAGE (#761) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Vote on HB 303 FINAL PASSAGE (#20) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 686. |
2018-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-18 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2018-05-16 | House | Notice of change of Senate conferees. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee membership changed: Cortez vice Carter. |
2018-05-16 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Gary Smith, Carter, and Morrell. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2018-05-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Gisclair, Terry Landry, and Franklin. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2018-05-14 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/14/18. |
2018-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-15 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-15 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2018-03-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/15/18. |
2018-03-14 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |