LA HB302 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the booting of motor vehicles parked on private property
Title
Provides relative to the booting of motor vehicles parked on private property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 302 FINAL PASSAGE (#475) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-26 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-26 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-04-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2022. |
2022-04-20 | House | Notice given. |
2022-04-20 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-20 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-04-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2022. |
2022-04-19 | House | Notice given. |
2022-04-19 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-19 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2022. |
2022-04-13 | House | Notice given. |
2022-04-13 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-13 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/13/2022. |
2022-04-11 | House | Notice given. |
2022-04-11 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/2022. |
2022-04-06 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-05 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |