LA HB30 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that a U.S. military identification card may be used at the polls for voting purposes (OR +$110,200 GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that a U.S. military identification card may be used at the polls for voting purposes (OR +$110,200 GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-04-24HouseReported with amendments (7-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-03-01HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/1/2019.
2019-02-25HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-02-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback