LA HB297 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to mayor's courts providing notice (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to mayor's courts providing notice (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 297 FINAL PASSAGE (#934) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2021-06-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2021. |
2021-06-01 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-27 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-03-30 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2021-03-30 | House | Prefiled. |