LA HB295 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-03 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-03 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the forms of payment a video draw poker device accepts
Title
Provides relative to the forms of payment a video draw poker device accepts
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#404) (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#64) (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#64) (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-03 | House | Effective date: 08/01/17. |
2017-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 54. |
2017-05-25 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-05-24 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-05-23 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 21 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-04-26 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 20. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/17. |
2017-04-20 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported favorably (12-0-1). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2017-03-30 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2017-03-30 | House | Prefiled. |