LA HB289 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes an income and corporate franchise tax credit for Class II and Class III railroads (EN -$2,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Establishes an income and corporate franchise tax credit for Class II and Class III railroads (EN -$2,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Jack McFarland [R] | Rep. Stuart Bishop [R] | Sen. Louie Bernard [R] | Sen. Franklin Foil [R] |
Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D] | Sen. Robert Mills [R] | Sen. John Morris [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 289 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#912) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 289 FINAL PASSAGE (#535) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 289 FINAL PASSAGE (#513) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 289 FINAL PASSAGE (#535) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 289 FINAL PASSAGE (#513) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-21 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-07-20 | House | Veto message read. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-06-29 | House | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2021-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2021-06-01 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/02/2021. |
2021-05-26 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-18 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-18 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-18 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2021. |
2021-05-12 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-03-30 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-03-30 | House | Prefiled. |