LA HB286 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective date: 06/16/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Extends the period for early voting prior to election day in presidential elections (EN +$408,000 GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the period for early voting prior to election day in presidential elections (EN +$408,000 GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 286 CO-AUTHORS (#514) (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 286 FINAL PASSAGE (#513) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 286 FINAL PASSAGE (#405) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16HouseEffective date: 06/16/2021.
2021-06-16HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 365.
2021-06-02HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-05-26HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-05-26SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-24SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-20SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-19SenateReported favorably.
2021-05-13SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2021-05-12SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-12HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2021.
2021-05-06HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-05HouseReported with amendments (10-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-03-30HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2021-03-30HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB286&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1208933
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221374
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229608
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235693
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220193
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221345
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1208986
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216988
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220341
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221539
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222379
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229838
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237940
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224144
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228548
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228549

Bill Comments 750

feedback