LA HB283 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-01 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-01 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the use of video cameras in classrooms where special education services are provided to certain students with exceptionalities (RE1 INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires the use of video cameras in classrooms where special education services are provided to certain students with exceptionalities (RE1 INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 283 FINAL PASSAGE (#567) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Recalled from final passage. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19. |
2019-05-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Reported favorably (7-0). |
2019-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-03-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-03-28 | House | Prefiled. |