LA HB283 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the use of video cameras in classrooms where special education services are provided to certain students with exceptionalities (RE1 INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the use of video cameras in classrooms where special education services are provided to certain students with exceptionalities (RE1 INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 283 FINAL PASSAGE (#567) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-01SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2019-06-01SenateRecalled from final passage.
2019-06-01SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-31SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2019-05-31SenateSenate Committee amendments read and adopted.
2019-05-31SenateRules suspended.
2019-05-31SenateReported with amendments.
2019-05-28SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-05-27SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-23HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
2019-05-22HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-21HouseReported favorably (7-0).
2019-05-15HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-05-14HouseReported with amendments (10-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-03-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-03-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB283&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120247
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133920
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137373
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125757
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133269
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133203
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133754
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133882
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134202
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140181
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140778
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140771
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120281
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124656
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134095
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134280
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137439
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140535
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137371

Bill Comments

feedback