LA HB283 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-20 - Effective date: January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-20 - Effective date: January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for technical recodification of certain provisions of the La. Insurance Code
Title
Provides for technical recodification of certain provisions of the La. Insurance Code
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 283, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#585) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 283, FINAL PASSAGE (#266) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 283, FINAL PASSAGE (#20) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 283, FINAL PASSAGE (#266) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 283, FINAL PASSAGE (#20) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | Effective date: January 1, 2012. | |
2011-06-20 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 94. | |
2011-06-15 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-15 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-14 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2011-06-14 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-06-13 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/14/2011. | |
2011-06-13 | Notice given. | |
2011-06-08 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2011-06-06 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/8/2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/7/2011. | |
2011-05-24 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2011-05-24 | Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-23 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-19 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-05-18 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-05-04 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2011-05-03 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-04-28 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/3/2011. | |
2011-04-28 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2011-04-27 | Reported favorably (10-0) (Local and Consent). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-14 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled. |