LA HB280 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes an income tax credit for certain primary care physician assistants (RE -$60,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes an income tax credit for certain primary care physician assistants (RE -$60,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - House Vote on HB 280 FINAL PASSAGE (#21) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-04-22 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/22/19. |
2019-04-16 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably (18-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-28 | House | Prefiled. |