LA HB275 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Eliminates the mandate for the corporation income tax deduction for federal income taxes paid (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Eliminates the mandate for the corporation income tax deduction for federal income taxes paid (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Neil Riser [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2021. |
2021-05-04 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported without amendments (12-0-1). |
2021-04-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported favorably (14-1. To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-03-30 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-03-30 | House | Prefiled. |