LA HB273 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relevant updates and technical corrections to statutes relative to contractors

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relevant updates and technical corrections to statutes relative to contractors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 273 FINAL PASSAGE (#40) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/23/19.
2019-04-17HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-16HouseReported with amendments (16-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2019-03-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2019-03-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback