LA HB27 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 6 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to elected officials who are members of the Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Louisiana (EN INCREASE APV)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to elected officials who are members of the Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Louisiana (EN INCREASE APV)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 27 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1030) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 27 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#754) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#477) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#155) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-06SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-06HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-06HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2019-06-05HouseNotice the Senate discharged the Conference Committee.
2019-06-05SenateNotice the House discharged the Conference Committee.
2019-06-05HouseDischarged from Conference Committee.
2019-06-04HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2019-06-04SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Peacock, Mizell, and Appel.
2019-06-03SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2019-06-03HouseHouse conferees appointed: Jones, Pearson, and Bacala.
2019-05-31SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2019-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, the House refused to concur in the amendments proposed by the Senate.
2019-05-31HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2019-05-28HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/19.
2019-05-28HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-05-27SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-21SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-20SenateReported with amendments.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2019-05-06SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-06HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/06/19.
2019-04-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably (6-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2019-02-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2019.
2019-02-22HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2019-02-22HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB27&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1113223
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120950
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127566
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128032
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137112
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143488
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143441
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144888
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135346
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138769
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140233
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143420
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1113224
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127819
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135541
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131365
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137904

Bill Comments

feedback