LA HB27 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Effective date: 04/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Effective date: 04/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the excise tax levied on certain alcoholic beverages (Item #20) (EN +$19,200,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Increases the excise tax levied on certain alcoholic beverages (Item #20) (EN +$19,200,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Kenny Cox [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - House Vote on HB 27 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#125) (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#105) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 27 AMENDMENT # 508 BY CLAITOR HB 27 BY COX (#104) (Y: 12 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-06 - House - House Vote on HB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#85) (Y: 76 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-06 - House - House Vote on HB 27 AMENDMENT # 732 BY CARMODY MOTION TO ADOPT (#84) (Y: 44 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2016-03-04 - House - House Vote on HB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#78) (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House Vote on HB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#78) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#105) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 27 AMENDMENT # 508 BY CLAITOR HB 27 BY COX (#104) (Y: 12 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-06 - House - House Vote on HB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#85) (Y: 76 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-06 - House - House Vote on HB 27 AMENDMENT # 732 BY CARMODY MOTION TO ADOPT (#84) (Y: 44 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2016-03-04 - House - House Vote on HB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#78) (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House Vote on HB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#78) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Effective date: 04/01/2016. |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 13. |
2016-03-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-03-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-03-09 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 72, nays 23. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. |
2016-03-09 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2016-03-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/09/2016. |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-03-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2016-03-06 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 25. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-03-06 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. |
2016-03-06 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2016-03-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 65, nays 34. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. |
2016-03-04 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-03-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/04/2016. |
2016-03-03 | House | Notice given. |
2016-03-03 | House | Notice removed |
2016-03-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-03-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-03-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/03/2016. |
2016-03-02 | House | Notice given. |
2016-03-02 | House | Notice removed |
2016-03-02 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-03-02 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-03-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/02/2016. |
2016-03-01 | House | Notice given. |
2016-03-01 | House | Notice removed |
2016-03-01 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-03-01 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-02-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/01/2016. |
2016-02-29 | House | Notice given. |
2016-02-29 | House | Notice removed |
2016-02-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-02-29 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-02-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/29/2016. |
2016-02-26 | House | Notice given. |
2016-02-26 | House | Notice removed |
2016-02-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/26/2016. |
2016-02-25 | House | Notice given. |
2016-02-25 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-02-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/25/2016. |
2016-02-23 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-02-23 | House | Rules suspended. |
2016-02-23 | House | Reported favorably (19-0). |
2016-02-14 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |