LA HB262 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Effective date: 08/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the sale of annuity products

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the sale of annuity products

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 262 FINAL PASSAGE (#469) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 262 FINAL PASSAGE (#251) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-06HouseEffective date: 08/01/2023.
2023-06-06HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 73.
2023-05-31HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2023-05-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2023-05-30HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2023-05-30HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2023-05-26SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2023-05-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2023-05-18SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2023-05-17SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2023-05-10SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2023-05-09SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2023-05-08HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2023-05-04HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/08/2023.
2023-04-27HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2023-04-26HouseReported favorably (9-0).
2023-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2023-04-03HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
2023-03-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2023-03-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback