LA HB26 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the governing authority of the town of Church Point to name a community center after a living person

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the governing authority of the town of Church Point to name a community center after a living person

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 26 FINAL PASSAGE (#154) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2019-05-06SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-06HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/06/19.
2019-04-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2019-02-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2019.
2019-02-22HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2019-02-22HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback