LA HB258 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the qualifications of jurors
Title
Provides relative to the qualifications of jurors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - House Vote on HB 258 JUDICIARY (#207) (Y: 39 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2022-04-06 | House | By a vote of 39 yeas, 32 nays, House Bill 258 was discharged from the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice and recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |