LA HB254 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 19, nays 71. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 19, nays 71. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increases campaign contribution limit for certain contributions.
Title
Increases campaign contribution limit for certain contributions.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Green [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 254 FINAL PASSAGE (#1038) (Y: 19 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2022-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 254 FINAL PASSAGE (#1038) (Y: 21 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2022-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 254 FINAL PASSAGE (#1038) (Y: 21 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 19, nays 71. Failed to pass. |
2022-05-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2022. |
2022-05-18 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-17 | House | Reported with amendments (8-5). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |