LA HB254 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/19.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to an award of custody to a person other than a parent

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to an award of custody to a person other than a parent

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/25/19.
2019-04-23HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-22HouseReported with amendments (6-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-03-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-03-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback