LA HB254 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-02 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-02 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to an award of custody to a person other than a parent
Title
Provides relative to an award of custody to a person other than a parent
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 254 FINAL PASSAGE (#174) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-06 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-06 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/06/19. |
2019-04-30 | House | Notice given. |
2019-04-30 | House | Notice removed |
2019-04-30 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-04-30 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Notice given. |
2019-04-25 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/19. |
2019-04-23 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-22 | House | Reported with amendments (6-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2019-03-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2019-03-27 | House | Prefiled. |