LA HB252 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Washington Artillery license plate
Title
Creates the Washington Artillery license plate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 252, ADOPT (#2005) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 252, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1924) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 252, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1263) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 252, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1243) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 252, FINAL PASSAGE (#996) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 252, FINAL PASSAGE (#25) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 252, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1924) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 252, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1263) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 252, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1243) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 252, FINAL PASSAGE (#996) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 252, FINAL PASSAGE (#25) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-07-06 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 978. | |
2010-06-23 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23. | |
2010-06-21 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2010-06-20 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/21/2010. | |
2010-06-18 | Conference committee report received. | |
2010-06-18 | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. | |
2010-06-16 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2010-06-15 | Senate conference committee members appointed: McPherson, Murray, and Walsworth. | |
2010-06-11 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2010-06-11 | House conferees appointed: Lorusso, Hutter, and Ligi. | |
2010-06-08 | Notice House rejected Senate amendments. | |
2010-06-08 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. | |
2010-06-08 | Reconsidered. | |
2010-06-08 | Rules suspended. | |
2010-06-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/8/2010. | |
2010-06-04 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-04 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-26 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-25 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-24 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |
2010-04-06 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-03-31 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 6, 2010. | |
2010-03-31 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-03-30 | Reported favorably (18-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-03-12 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010. | |
2010-03-10 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-03-10 | Prefiled. |