LA HB25 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 7 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expands the Louisiana New Markets Jobs Act tax credit to certain recovery zones (Item #65) (EG NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands the Louisiana New Markets Jobs Act tax credit to certain recovery zones (Item #65) (EG NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-06 - House - House Vote on HB 25 FINAL PASSAGE (#36) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-07SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2020-10-06HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-10-05HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/06/20.
2020-10-05HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-05HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-05HouseReported favorably (11-0).
2020-09-28HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback