LA HB25 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides a universal definition of "serious bodily injury" for purposes of Title 14 of the La. Revised Statutes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides a universal definition of "serious bodily injury" for purposes of Title 14 of the La. Revised Statutes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 25 FINAL PASSAGE (#335) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 25 FINAL PASSAGE (#111) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-15HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-14HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-05-14SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-09SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-08SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-07SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-01SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2019-04-30SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-30HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-30HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-04-30HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/30/19.
2019-04-25HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-24HouseReported with amendments (9-0-1).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-02-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2019.
2019-02-21HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-02-21HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback