LA HB249 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates funds for payment of a consent judgment against the state in the suit captioned Gerald R. White, et ux versus La. Dept. of Transportation and Development, et al.
Title
Appropriates funds for payment of a consent judgment against the state in the suit captioned Gerald R. White, et ux versus La. Dept. of Transportation and Development, et al.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |