LA HB248 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for parenting coordinators in child custody proceedings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for parenting coordinators in child custody proceedings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 248 FINAL PASSAGE (#223) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-22SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-21SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2019-05-13SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2019-05-09SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-08HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/08/19.
2019-05-01HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-30HouseReported favorably (6-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-03-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-03-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback