LA HB246 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 51-30-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 51-30-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Exempts property owned by certain disabled veterans and spouses from ad valorem property tax (EN -$2,000,000 LF RV See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Exempts property owned by certain disabled veterans and spouses from ad valorem property tax (EN -$2,000,000 LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 246, CO-AUTHORS (#1389) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 246, FINAL PASSAGE (#1388) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 246, FINAL PASSAGE (#730) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 246, FINAL PASSAGE (#1388) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 246, FINAL PASSAGE (#730) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Effective date: See Act. | |
2010-07-08 | Becomes Act No. 1049. | |
2010-06-23 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2010-06-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-14 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-11 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-10 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-09 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-08 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-07 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-13 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |
2010-05-12 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-11 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 11, 2010. | |
2010-05-04 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-03 | Reported without amendments (9-0) (Regular). | |
2010-04-28 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2010-04-27 | Reported favorably (14-0) (Regular) To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2010-03-12 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010. | |
2010-03-10 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2010-03-10 | Prefiled. |