LA HB245 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to employment practices related to wage history, wage disclosure, and retaliation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to employment practices related to wage history, wage disclosure, and retaliation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-26HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-24HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021.
2021-05-24HouseNotice given.
2021-05-13HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-10HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2021.
2021-05-10HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-06HouseReported favorably (7-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
2021-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback