LA HB242 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits certain claims fees assessed by health insurers or pharmacy benefit managers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits certain claims fees assessed by health insurers or pharmacy benefit managers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 242 FINAL PASSAGE (#280) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-22SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-15SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2019-05-14SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-14HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-01HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2019-03-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2019-03-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback