LA HB241 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Effective date: 08/01/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Effective date: 08/01/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to expungement of records
Title
Provides relative to expungement of records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 241 FINAL PASSAGE (#521) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 241 FINAL PASSAGE (#389) (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 241 FINAL PASSAGE (#389) (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | House | Effective date: 08/01/20. |
2020-06-05 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 78. |
2020-06-02 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-29 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2020-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 19. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-22 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-05-22 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-15 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2020-02-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2020-02-26 | House | Prefiled. |