LA HB24 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the enrollment of additional employees in the Parochial Employees' Retirement System of Louisiana (RE INCREASE APV)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the enrollment of additional employees in the Parochial Employees' Retirement System of Louisiana (RE INCREASE APV)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 24 FINAL PASSAGE (#153) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-21SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-08SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2019-05-07SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-06HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/06/19.
2019-04-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably (6-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2019-02-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2019.
2019-02-21HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2019-02-21HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback