LA HB239 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Effective date: 06/11/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the harvesting of cypress trees on state property

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the harvesting of cypress trees on state property

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 239 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#930) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 239 FINAL PASSAGE (#600) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 239 FINAL PASSAGE (#308) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11HouseEffective date: 06/11/2021.
2021-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 190.
2021-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-02HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2021-06-01HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/02/2021.
2021-05-27HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-05-27SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-20SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-19SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-18SenateReported favorably.
2021-05-11SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2021-05-10SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-10HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2021.
2021-05-03HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-29HouseReported with amendments (13-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2021-03-26HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021.
2021-03-26HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2021-03-26HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB239&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1207470
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219269
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231004
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235201
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214361
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218386
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218970
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227585
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229293
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1207480
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219310
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230018
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237837
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222704
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229311
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230904

Bill Comments

feedback