LA HB236 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 23 in Room F
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes certain parishes to name a sports complex in honor of a living person

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes certain parishes to name a sports complex in honor of a living person

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 236 FINAL PASSAGE (#470) (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2019-05-21SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-21HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 16. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-21HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/21/19.
2019-05-15HouseNotice given.
2019-05-15HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19.
2019-05-06HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably (14-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2019-03-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2019-03-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback