LA HB232 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to discharge and dismissals of prosecutions for misdemeanor convictions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to discharge and dismissals of prosecutions for misdemeanor convictions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 232 FINAL PASSAGE (#599) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 232 FINAL PASSAGE (#194) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10HouseEffective date: 08/01/2021.
2021-06-10HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 124.
2021-06-02HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-05-27HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-05-27SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 8 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-20SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-19SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-18SenateReported favorably.
2021-05-06SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2021-05-05SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-04HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021.
2021-04-28HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-27HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-03-26HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021.
2021-03-25HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-03-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback