LA HB231 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the disposition of dogs used in dogfighting
Title
Provides relative to the disposition of dogs used in dogfighting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 231 FINAL PASSAGE (#98) (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-04-27 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-04-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2021. |
2021-04-26 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2021-03-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021. |
2021-03-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2021-03-25 | House | Prefiled. |