LA HB229 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increases the amount of per diem authorized to be paid to board members of Concordia Parish Hospital Service District No. 1

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the amount of per diem authorized to be paid to board members of Concordia Parish Hospital Service District No. 1

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 229 FINAL PASSAGE (#685) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 229 FINAL PASSAGE (#153) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-07HouseEffective date: August 1, 2013.
2013-06-07HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 138.
2013-05-31HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2013-05-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2013-05-29HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2013-05-28HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2013-05-28SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2013-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2013-05-23SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2013-05-22SenateReported favorably.
2013-04-30SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2013-04-29SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2013-04-29HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2013-04-24HouseScheduled for floor debate on 4/29/2013.
2013-04-23HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
2013-04-22HouseReported favorably (13-0) (Local and Consent).
2013-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2013-04-01HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
2013-03-25HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2013-03-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback